Financial history DANBY WISKE VILLAGE HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 260547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £60.63k £13.66k £17.43k £23.38k £21.45k
Total expenditure £53.83k £15.32k £16.10k £4.18k £11.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.35k N/A N/A £19.43k £10.67k