CROYDON NATURAL HISTORY AND SCIENTIFIC SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 260739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.64k £12.22k £14.20k £13.59k £15.82k
Total expenditure £11.71k £17.72k £21.61k £14.42k £15.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.00k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.00k