CROYDON NATURAL HISTORY AND SCIENTIFIC SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 260739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Philip Bush Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
MARK ANDREW TYSON Trustee 22 July 2013 None on record
BRENDA JANICE HAWKINS Trustee None on record
CELIA ELAINE BAILEY Trustee None on record
JOHN HICKMAN Trustee 28 June 2013 None on record
BRIAN LANCASTER Trustee None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN WESTCOTT TAYLOR Trustee None on record
IAN GARRYK PAYNE Trustee None on record
Dr JOHN BEAMISH GREIG Trustee None on record
ANTONY SKRZYPCZYK Trustee 24 April 2014 None on record
Kenneth Edward Woodhams Trustee 20 April 2017 None on record
CAROLE ANN ROBERTS Chair 24 April 2014 None on record
Pamela Jacqueline Norton Buttrey Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record