SOUTHWARK AND LAMBETH ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 260745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 August 2021 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 05 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 25 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 22 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required