Financial history MACMILLAN CANCER SUPPORT

Charity number: 261017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £247.44m £252.69m £235.72m £232.83m £194.89m
Total expenditure £245.59m £256.42m £260.75m £245.74m £147.80m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £105.00k £2.03m £7.76m
Income - Donations and legacies £233.22m £229.59m £213.09m £208.11m £169.01m
Income - Other trading activities £11.38m £17.25m £17.60m £18.85m £16.45m
Income - Charitable activities £324.00k £831.00k £158.00k £2.08m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.52m £5.02m £4.88m £3.80m £1.34m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £8.09m
Income - Legacies £76.75m £84.54m £80.04m £77.72m £71.82m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £173.24m £191.99m £195.05m £180.83m £89.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £72.35m £64.43m £65.71m £64.91m £58.47m
Expenditure - Governance £999.00k £1.20m £1.98m £1.36m £766.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £75.26m £0 £79.26m £61.92m £28.51m
Expenditure - Investment management £568.00k £777.00k £814.00k £727.00k £638.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0