Governance MACMILLAN CANCER SUPPORT

Charity number: 261017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 21 June 1989: Standard registration
  • 27 September 2011: Funds received from 1121915 CANCER JOURNEY
  • 05 November 2014: Funds received from 1093520 THE JOHN NICKOLS FOUNDATION
  • 07 September 2015: Funds received from 1062216 A.L. PADLEY CHARITY FUND
  • 12 December 2016: Funds received from 1117823 MARGARET ELUNED JAMES CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 07 August 2017: Funds received from 1109213 RARER CANCERS FOUNDATION
  • 03 January 2018: Funds received from 1058953 INNER WHEEL CLUB OF ROSS-ON-WYE
  • 01 June 2018: Funds received from 1057820 BRACKNELL THURSDAY STROKE CLUB
  • 13 November 2018: Funds received from 1085021 THE OPERATION HENRY TRUST
  • 27 July 2019: Funds received from 1126025 BEN VOLLER G4 FUND
  • 06 August 2019: Funds received from 503246 FRODSHAM NURSING FUND
  • 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
  • 14 September 2020: Funds received from 1071380 JR AND SA BROOKS CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 08 January 2021: Funds received from 241850 LADY NOEL BYRON'S NURSING CHARITY (OCKHAM BRANCH)
  • 12 May 2021: Funds received from 228545 ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES GRAND COUNCI...
  • 21 June 2021: Funds received from 1038178 THE BAMFORD AND NORDEN WOMEN'S CLUB
  • 14 September 2021: Funds received from 510369 TRAFFORD ONCOLOGY SOCIETY
  • 20 December 2021: Funds received from 1184286 LEIGHTON HOSPITAL PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT GROUP
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MACMILLAN (Working name)
  • CANCER RELIEF MACMILLAN FUND (Previous name)
  • MACMILLAN CANCER RELIEF (Previous name)
  • NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR CANCER RELIEF (Previous name)
  • THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR CANCER RELIEF (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property