G P S MACPHERSON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 261045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £139.01k £445.65k £141.17k £17.12k £17.24k
Total expenditure £5.83k £45.87k £420.97k £6.84k £10.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A