G P S MACPHERSON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 261045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 06 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 28 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 28 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 03 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 03 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 06 June 2017 On time Download