THE SAMUEL GARDNER MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 261059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 24 May 2017 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 24 May 2017 108 days late Download