THE LISZT SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 261164
Charity reporting is overdue by 1022 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 291 days
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 14 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 657 days
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 14 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1022 days
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2018 18 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 14 April 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2017 24 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 14 April 2016 07 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2016 21 November 2016 On time Download