NORLAND CONSERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 261166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.19k £5.86k £9.58k £8.23k £6.04k
Total expenditure £3.30k £2.63k £3.41k £6.65k £1.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A