THE FRIENDS OF STANSTED HALL - THE ARTHUR FINDLAY COLLEGE

Charity number: 261287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.12k £4.77k £4.79k £3.93k £619
Total expenditure £3.60k £2.21k £4.27k £4.95k £618
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A