HASTINGS MUSICAL FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity number: 261351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £242.79k £306.55k £396.07k £396.71k £396.71k
Total expenditure £241.24k £304.61k £376.45k £397.44k £397.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A