Accounts and annual returns ROYAL ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 261421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 13 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 13 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window