Accounts and annual returns KOLEISS ZEDOKOH LIMITED

Charity number: 262170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 February 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 25 February 2021 20 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 20 February 2019 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 20 February 2019 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 30 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window