Financial history KOLEISS ZEDOKOH LIMITED

Charity number: 262170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £205.58k £307.03k £104.61k £124.65k £98.41k
Total expenditure £54.61k £62.89k £85.34k £19.95k £25.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A