Financial history HENRY ROGERS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 262927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £20.65k £20.91k £20.99k £19.48k £20.91k
Total expenditure £14.03k £11.16k £15.56k £29.30k £15.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A