PICKFORD TRUST

Charity number: 263529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £20.69k £27.52k £32.08k £31.27k £11.89k
Total expenditure £43.86k £47.55k £39.46k £34.96k £27.80k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A