THE MODERN LAW REVIEW LIMITED

Charity number: 264072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £183.71k £195.96k £196.80k £204.50k £194.11k
Total expenditure £173.09k £144.30k £141.78k £141.63k £192.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A