Financial history THE HAROLD HYAM WINGATE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 264114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £85.77k £86.24k £80.61k £51.97k £44.88k
Total expenditure £563.50k £503.69k £480.00k £427.97k £428.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A