DAVID JOHN COHEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 264318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £2.33k £1.67k £2.02k £2.14k £4.14k
Total expenditure £24.42k £26.55k £21.05k £21.72k £23.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A