HART VOICES

Charity number: 264333
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 June 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 05 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required