HART VOICES

Charity number: 264333
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £10.90k £14.73k £15.82k £14.72k £10.92k
Total expenditure £11.21k £12.08k £14.54k £13.78k £10.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A