THE ALFRED AND FRANCES RUBENS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 264430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 27 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 27 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 04 September 2017 On time Download