THE HIGH WYCOMBE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 264434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 01/06/2017 01/06/2018 01/06/2019 01/06/2020
Total gross income £12.80k £12.87k £13.61k £14.57k £9.06k
Total expenditure £14.46k £13.49k £14.13k £14.45k £7.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £222 £0 £0 N/A N/A