THE ISAACS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 264590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 18 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 18 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 20 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required