THE ISAACS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 264590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £23.69k £25.37k £23.83k £23.74k £10.21k
Total expenditure £22.50k £23.25k £23.00k £22.00k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A