Financial history FAMILY ACTION

Charity number: 264713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £23.39m £32.35m £37.29m £41.07m £35.23m
Total expenditure £22.08m £28.71m £35.81m £38.11m £32.78m
Income from government contracts £15.73m £26.63m £30.46m £31.20m £24.92m
Income from government grants N/A £949.73k £1.47m £375.47k £818.99k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.47m £1.36m £1.30m £3.61m £2.62m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £20.50m £28.49m £35.63m £37.21m £32.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £385.00k £423.00k £364.00k £241.00k £288.00k
Income - Other £35.00k £2.08m £0 £0 £223.00k
Income - Legacies £74.98k £0 £41.68k £9.90k £266.87k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.53m £28.02m £35.08m £37.58m £32.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £550.00k £692.00k £732.00k £537.00k £581.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £33.00k £31.00k £32.00k £32.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £700.00k £300.00k £2.90m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £59.00k £75.00k £80.00k £119.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0