SHARE COMMUNITY LIMITED

Charity number: 264894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £952.15k £973.05k £1.09m £1.18m £1.26m
Total expenditure £818.59k £934.50k £1.02m £1.12m £1.15m
Income from government contracts £52.32k £50.00k £37.50k N/A £980.28k
Income from government grants £2.50k £0 N/A N/A £8.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £44.33k £42.45k £40.89k £28.09k £29.26k
Income - Other trading activities £67.16k £59.64k £49.65k £55.64k £43.53k
Income - Charitable activities £840.40k £870.75k £999.96k £1.10m £1.18m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £261 £216 £131 £110 £1.42k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £777.43k £880.52k £973.68k £1.09m £1.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £41.17k £53.98k £42.05k £30.23k £28.24k
Expenditure - Governance £34.28k £37.50k £0 £38.61k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0