SHARE COMMUNITY LIMITED

Charity number: 264894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven Ray Pettengell Trustee 11 June 2018 None on record
Natasha French Trustee 02 August 2021 None on record
Katie Thomas Trustee 02 August 2021 None on record
Michael Richard Barnett Trustee 11 June 2018 None on record
Srishti Mahhajan Trustee 01 October 2018
WESTMINSTER CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU SERVICE Received: On time
Christopher Jeffery Trustee 02 August 2021 None on record
Simon John Allocca Trustee 03 April 2019 None on record
Jayshree Shashikant Dave Trustee 09 April 2018 None on record
Karen Elizabeth McKay Trustee 05 December 2016 None on record
KATE Elizabeth HEAPS Chair 01 October 2018 None on record
David Fox Trustee 07 December 2020 None on record