Financial history THE SIR MARK AND LADY TURNER CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 264994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £8.09k £8.11k £8.23k £8.48k £8.25k
Total expenditure £9.50k £7.67k £9.15k £7.68k £6.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A