THE A L GRANT 1ST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 265009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 28 July 2020 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 26 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 22 February 2018 298 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required