THE A L GRANT 1ST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 265009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £834 £861 £909 £969 £996
Total expenditure £942 £493 £1.30k £898 £1.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A