MSI REPRODUCTIVE CHOICES

Charity number: 265543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Glenda Kay Burkhart Trustee 06 March 2020 None on record
Dr Mohsina Ahsan Bilgrami Trustee 25 August 2015 None on record
Dr KRISTIN ANNE RUTTER Trustee 13 October 2011 None on record
PHILIP DOW HARVEY Trustee 09 October 1992 None on record
CLAIRE EMMA MORRIS Trustee 23 March 2015
OPTIONS FOR INTERNATIONAL HEALTH Received: On time
FIONA MARGARET DUBY Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
MR Franki Nicolas Braeken Trustee 21 November 2016 None on record
Jess Search Trustee 29 July 2016
DOC SOCIETY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time