BATH ARTS WORKSHOP LIMITED

Charity number: 266038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £308.23k £389.88k £351.02k £359.05k £336.42k
Total expenditure £302.11k £315.07k £347.86k £368.15k £372.13k
Income from government contracts £154.57k £139.79k £166.00k £150.09k £143.72k
Income from government grants £31.46k £0 N/A N/A N/A