ALLINGTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 266434
Charity reporting is up to date (154 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 April 2021 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 April 2021 520 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 March 2021 871 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 March 2021 1236 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 June 2018 581 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 11 August 2016 On time Download