ALLINGTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 266434
Charity reporting is up to date (154 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £78.30k £95.44k £87.41k £77.32k £63.76k
Total expenditure £77.99k £90.89k £93.34k £101.72k £101.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A