Financial history BRITISH MERCHANT NAVY WELFARE SOCIETY ALEXANDRIA

Charity number: 266456
Charity reporting is overdue by 870 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £577 £542 £530 £509 £554
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A