THE JOHN AND SUSAN BOWERS FUND

Charity number: 266616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £33.17k £38.15k £36.77k £37.30k £37.95k
Total expenditure £40.20k £33.17k £43.71k £29.61k £36.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A