Financial history ARGOSY PLAYERS

Charity number: 266728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £27.65k £28.88k £24.94k £20.68k £712
Total expenditure £25.19k £32.69k £31.97k £20.65k £2.74k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £750 £1.15k N/A N/A N/A