Financial history LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ST BARNABAS HOSPITAL SALTASH

Charity number: 266967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £7.09k £6.51k £6.60k £1.26k £10.00k
Total expenditure £14.65k £10.70k £3.31k £9.29k £1.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A