THE DVORAK SOCIETY

Charity number: 267336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARJOHN DAVID ROBERTS Chair 27 April 2019 None on record
ANNETTE PERCY Trustee
FUNDS HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE DUNHAM ROAD UNITARIAN CHAPEL Received: On time
NEW GRAVEL PIT UNITARIAN CHAPEL FUND Received: On time
Martin Anthony Brenner Israel Trustee 01 May 2021 None on record
KAREL JANOVICKY Trustee None on record
TERENCE JAMES HEARD Trustee 09 January 2014 None on record
GORDON VERNON WATTS Trustee None on record
SUSAN JENKINSON Trustee 08 April 2017 None on record
David Banister Trustee 04 May 2014 None on record
Michael Geoffrey Fage Trustee 14 May 2020 None on record