10TH EDMONTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 267755
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required