10TH EDMONTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 267755
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £20.10k £21.18k £19.84k £23.17k £27.98k
Total expenditure £18.16k £22.88k £16.16k £19.50k £10.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £14.00k