CAPEL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 267775
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £108.36k £76.81k £76.58k £70.39k £73.85k
Total expenditure £114.68k £58.67k £73.11k £83.16k £82.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £30.00k £30.00k £9.62k N/A