THE BRITISH CAVE RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 267828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £43.33k £31.18k £39.16k £37.03k £34.53k
Total expenditure £32.40k £31.17k £46.50k £45.54k £42.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A