THE BRITISH CAVE RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 267828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Andrew Smith Trustee 15 October 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR JOHN GUNN Chair None on record
JENNIFER POTTS Trustee None on record
Dr Andrew Farrant Trustee 31 October 2015 None on record
MR DAVID GIBSON Trustee None on record
Joanne White Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
DAVID GOUGH Trustee 21 August 2011 None on record
Leslie Williams Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Dr David Lowe Trustee 31 October 2015 None on record
Michael Butcher Trustee 15 October 2017 None on record
ANDREW JAMES EAVIS Trustee
THE GHAR PARAU FOUNDATION Recently registered
Paul Hardwick Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record