TRUST FUND OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, PLATT

Charity number: 268240
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Overdue Overdue by 4215 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 Overdue Overdue by 4580 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 Overdue Overdue by 4946 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Overdue Overdue by 5311 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 10 June 2005 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required