TRUST FUND OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, PLATT

Charity number: 268240
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008
Total gross income £171 £133 £133 £133 £133
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A