THE ANCHORAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 268679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £39.39k £3.85k £7.02k £45.63k £28.37k
Total expenditure £34.68k £5.81k £625 £25.49k £36.19k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A